WI AB171 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 563.92 (1m) (c) 1.; and to create 563.03 (5r) (c), 563.03 (10q), 563.03 (10r) and 563.935 (9m) of the statutes; Relating to: paddlewheel raffles. (FE)
Title
Paddlewheel raffles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-05-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-04-02 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced |