WI AB168 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0501 (4) (a); and to create 61.327 of the statutes; Relating to: village officers serving as village employees.
Title
Village officers serving as village employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2021-05-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-04-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-04-07 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced |