WI AB166 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-8)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Published 6-28-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-8)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Published 6-28-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (b) 48. of the statutes; Relating to: creating an individual income tax exemption for military income received by active duty members of the U.S. armed forces who die in a combat zone. (FE)
Title
Creating an individual income tax exemption for military income received by active duty members of the U.S. armed forces who die in a combat zone. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Published 6-28-2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 6-27-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 19 |
2013-06-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-26-2013 |
2013-05-16 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 5-16-2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senator Miller added as a cosponsor |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2013-05-14 | House | A. Ott, August, Ballweg, Barca, Barnes, Berceau, Bernard Schaber, Bewley, Billings, C. Taylor, Clark, Danou, Doyle, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Hintz, Hulsey, Hutton, J. Ott, Johnson, Kapenga, Kaufert, Kerkman, Kessler, Klenke, Knodl, Knudson, Kooyenga, Kramer, Krug, Kuglitsch, LeMahieu, Loudenbeck, Mason, Milroy, Mursau, Murtha, Nerison, Neylon, Nygren, Pasch, Pope, Richards, Riemer, Ringhand, Sargent, Severson, Shankland, Sinicki, Smith, Steineke, Stone, Stroebel, Swearingen, Tauchen, Vos, Vruwink, Wachs, Weininger, Williams, Wright, Young, Zamarripa and Zepnick of the Assembly added as coauthors |
2013-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-05-14 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2013-05-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-05-14 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to calendar of 5-14-2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Veterans, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2013-05-09 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Veterans, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2013-05-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-05-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Born |
2013-05-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans |
2013-04-25 | House | Introduced |