WI AB165 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Published 11-28-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 13.176 of the statutes; Relating to: appointing delegates for a convention under Article V of the United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appointing delegates for a convention under Article V of the United States Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-28HousePublished 11-28-2017
2017-11-28HouseReport approved by the Governor on 11-27-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 83
2017-11-22HousePresented to the Governor on 11-22-2017
2017-11-22HouseReport correctly enrolled on 11-22-2017
2017-11-22HouseLRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1)
2017-11-08HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2017-11-07SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-07SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2017-11-07SenateRules suspended
2017-11-07SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-07SenateSenate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2017-11-07SenateRead a second time
2017-11-07SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth
2017-11-03SenatePlaced on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-06-20SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-06-20SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2017-06-15SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-06-14HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-06-14HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 58, Noes 37, Paired 2
2017-06-14HouseRules suspended
2017-06-14HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-06-14HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2017-06-14HouseRead a second time
2017-06-14HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2017-06-07HousePlaced on calendar 6-14-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-06-02HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-06-02HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 2
2017-06-02HouseReport Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 2
2017-05-31HouseExecutive action taken
2017-05-16HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier
2017-04-21HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Bernier
2017-04-21HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Bernier
2017-04-21HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier
2017-03-28HousePublic hearing held
2017-03-20HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Federalism and Interstate Relations
2017-03-20HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback