WI AB165 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 60.61 (3r) and 60.62 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: town zoning ordinances affecting shorelands.
Title
Town zoning ordinances affecting shorelands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 41 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-18-2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Local Government |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a second time |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced |