WI AB162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 146.89 (3) (a) and 146.89 (3) (d) 2.; and to create 146.89 (3g) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in the Volunteer Health Care Provider program by agencies serving homeless individuals. (FE)
Title
Participation in the Volunteer Health Care Provider program by agencies serving homeless individuals. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Senator Craig added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-31 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Medicaid Reform and Oversight, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Medicaid Reform and Oversight |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab162 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB162.pdf |