WI AB162 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 229.685 (2) and 341.14 (6r) (b) 13. b.; and to create 20.395 (5) (ij) of the statutes; Relating to: proceeds from special registration plates associated with professional baseball park districts and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Proceeds from special registration plates associated with professional baseball park districts and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 249 |
2018-04-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Johnson, Schachtner, Larson and L. Taylor |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:01 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ott |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-06-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced |