WI AB161 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Published 3-28-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Published 3-28-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 806.08 (3) and 808.05; to amend 806.08 (1), 808.07 (2) (a) (intro.), 808.07 (2) (a) 1., 808.07 (2) (a) 2., 809.12 and 813.025 (title); and to create 806.08 (3) (b), 808.05 (1m) (d), 808.05 (2m) and 813.025 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: injunctions suspending or restraining the enforcement or execution statewide of a statute of this state.
Title
Injunctions suspending or restraining the enforcement or execution statewide of a statute of this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Assembly: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - Assembly: Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Published 3-28-2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 156 |
2014-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 60, Noes 36 |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 38 |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kessler and C. Taylor |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Grothman |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-06-06 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-06 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 57, Noes 39 |
2013-05-14 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:01 PM on 6-4-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 10 |
2013-05-14 | House | Refused to suspend rules to read a third time, Ayes 55, Noes 39 |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Refused to refer to committee on Judiciary, Ayes 39, Noes 55 |
2013-05-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2013-05-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-04-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing |
2013-04-19 | House | Introduced |