WI AB16 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Published 4-9-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Published 4-9-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 165.71 of the statutes; Relating to: posters regarding the national human trafficking resource center hotline. (FE)
Title
Posters regarding the national human trafficking resource center hotline. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 5 |
2015-04-07 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Representative Wachs added as a coauthor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-02-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-02-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-02-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-02-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2015-02-12 | House | Representatives Kolste, Sargent, Bernier and Zepnick added as coauthors |
2015-02-12 | House | Read a second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on calendar 2-12-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-02-10 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-30 | House | Representative Johnson added as a coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced |