WI AB159 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.57 (3), 346.60 (3m) (a), 346.65 (5m) and 349.06 (3); and to create 340.01 (55u) of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for certain traffic offenses committed while sanitation workers are at risk from traffic and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Penalties for certain traffic offenses committed while sanitation workers are at risk from traffic and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-07 | House | Representative Wright added as a coauthor |
2013-05-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kessler, Johnson and Hebl |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on calendar 5-7-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2013-05-02 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-04-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-30 | House | Representatives Johnson and Knudson added as coauthors |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice |
2013-04-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab159 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB159.pdf |