WI AB157 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.528 of the statutes; Relating to: an exemption from civil liability related to the placement of buoys or other markers in waterways.
Title
An exemption from civil liability related to the placement of buoys or other markers in waterways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2015-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-06-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Milroy, Shankland and Hesselbein |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Spreitzer |
2015-06-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative A. Ott |
2015-05-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2015-04-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab157 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB157.pdf |