WI AB157 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 341.01 (2) (a); to renumber and amend 340.01 (38m) and 341.269 (1); to amend 341.10 (6), 341.266 (1) (am) (intro.), 341.266 (1) (c) 2., 341.266 (2) (a), 341.269 (2) (a) and 341.269 (3); and to create 340.01 (38m) (a) 2., 341.01 (2) (af), 341.269 (1) (b) and 341.269 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: motor vehicle registration by the Department of Transportation, historic military vehicles, and Kei class vehicles. (FE)
Title
Motor vehicle registration by the Department of Transportation, historic military vehicles, and Kei class vehicles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-09-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-09-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2013-08-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-06-17 | House | Representative Ohnstad withdrawn as a coauthor |
2013-05-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-04-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-04-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab157 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB157.pdf |