WI AB155 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 1.12 (1) (b), 13.172 (1), 13.62 (2), 13.95 (intro.), 16.002 (2), 16.004 (4), 16.004 (5), 16.004 (12) (a), 16.045 (1) (a), 16.15 (1) (ab), 16.41 (4), 16.417 (1) (a), 16.52 (7), 16.528 (1) (a), 16.53 (2), 16.54 (9) (a) 1., 16.70 (2), 16.72 (2) (e) (intro.), 16.72 (2) (f), 16.75 (1m), 16.75 (8) (a) 1., 16.75 (8) (a) 2., 16.75 (9), 16.765 (1), 16.765 (2), 16.765 (4), 16.765 (5), 16.765 (6), 16.765 (7) (intro.), 16.765 (7) (d), 16.765 (8), 16.85 (2), 16.865 (8), 25.50 (1) (d), 49.45 (2) (a) 3., 71.26 (1) (be), 77.54 (9a) (a), 101.055 (2) (a), 230.03 (3), 230.80 (4), 230.90 (1) (c) and 635.18 (1); to repeal and recreate 230.03 (3); and to create 13.94 (1) (dj), 13.94 (1s) (c) 9., 40.02 (54) (n), 70.11 (41c) and chapter 636 of the statutes; Relating to: the Badger Health Benefit Authority, health benefit exchange operation, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The Badger Health Benefit Authority, health benefit exchange operation, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-12 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Insurance and take up (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Insurance and take up, Ayes 35, Noes 61 |
2015-07-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-25 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2015-04-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2015-04-08 | House | Introduced |