WI AB154 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Published 5-15-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 14.16 (17) of the statutes; Relating to: creating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14HousePublished 5-15-2021
2021-05-14HouseReport approved by the Governor on 5-14-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 31
2021-05-13HousePresented to the Governor on 5-13-2021
2021-05-13HouseReport correctly enrolled on 5-13-2021
2021-05-11HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2021-05-11SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-05-11SenateSenator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor
2021-05-11SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended
2021-05-11SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-05-11SenateRead a second time
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
2021-05-11SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-05-11SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-05-11HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-05-11HouseRepresentatives Loudenbeck, S. Rodriguez and Schraa added as coauthors
2021-05-11HouseRead a third time and passed
2021-05-11HouseRules suspended
2021-05-11HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-05-11HouseRead a second time
2021-05-10HouseSenator Agard added as a cosponsor
2021-05-10HouseRepresentatives Spreitzer, Subeck and Emerson added as coauthors
2021-05-06HousePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-05-05HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-05-05HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2021-04-29HouseExecutive action taken
2021-04-29HousePublic hearing held
2021-04-29HouseRepresentative Hesselbein added as a coauthor
2021-03-10HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback