WI AB154 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.27 (9) (a) 1. b. of the statutes; Relating to: annual or consecutive month permits for vehicles or combinations of vehicles transporting loads near the Wisconsin-Michigan border. (FE)
Title
Annual or consecutive month permits for vehicles or combinations of vehicles transporting loads near the Wisconsin-Michigan border. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-24 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2013-05-24 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2013-05-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-23 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Swearingen |
2013-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-04-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab154 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB154.pdf |