WI AB153 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 108.142 (4); to amend 108.06 (1); and to create 108.06 (1m) and 227.01 (13) (yL) of the statutes; Relating to: the amount of benefits received under the unemployment insurance law. (FE)
Title
The amount of benefits received under the unemployment insurance law. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-05-09 | House | LRB correction |
2023-04-24 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-04-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2023-04-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-04-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-11 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2023-04-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities |
2023-04-07 | House | Introduced |