WI AB153 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 753.06 (4) (a), 753.06 (4) (c), 753.06 (4) (dm), 753.06 (7) (ag), 753.06 (7) (ar), 753.06 (7) (e), 753.06 (9) (e), 753.06 (9) (g), 753.06 (9) (L), 753.06 (10) (f), 753.06 (10) (g) and 753.06 (10) (L) of the statutes; Relating to: adding a circuit court branch in Adams, Calumet, Clark, Dunn, Eau Claire, Jackson, Langlade, Manitowoc, Marathon, Sawyer, Vilas, and Waushara counties. (FE)
Title
Adding a circuit court branch in Adams, Calumet, Clark, Dunn, Eau Claire, Jackson, Langlade, Manitowoc, Marathon, Sawyer, Vilas, and Waushara counties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-12 | House | Representative Stafsholt added as a coauthor |
2019-06-11 | House | Representative Summerfield added as a coauthor |
2019-05-31 | House | Representative Quinn added as a coauthor |
2019-04-18 | House | Representative Kulp added as a coauthor |
2019-04-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab153 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB153.pdf |