WI AB152 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 944.17 (2) (a), 944.17 (2) (c) and 944.17 (2) (d); to renumber and amend 944.17 (2) (intro.); to amend 173.07 (1), 173.10, 173.13 (1) (a) 8., 173.21 (1) (a), 173.22 (4) (d) (intro.), 173.22 (4) (d) 1., 173.22 (4) (d) 2., 173.22 (4) (e) and 301.45 (1d) (b); and to create 944.18 and 948.015 (11) of the statutes; Relating to: sexual contact with an animal and providing a penalty.
Title
Sexual contact with an animal and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Emerson |
2019-10-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wichgers |
2019-04-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-04-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab152 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB152.pdf |