WI AB15 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 442.04 (5) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: educational qualifications for certified public accountants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational qualifications for certified public accountants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-19HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a coauthor
2021-03-17HousePlaced on calendar 3-23-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-17HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-03-17HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2021-03-11HouseExecutive action taken
2021-03-04HousePublic hearing held
2021-02-12HouseRepresentative Allen added as a coauthor
2021-01-25HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback