WI AB15 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-17)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-17)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 299.97 (1); and to create 299.50 of the statutes; Relating to: the manufacture and acceptance for sale of products containing microbeads. (FE)
Title
The manufacture and acceptance for sale of products containing microbeads. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-14 | House | Representatives Spreitzer and Barca added as coauthors |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-02-17 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-02 | House | Representative Billings added as a coauthor |
2015-01-29 | House | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2015-01-28 | House | Representative Nerison added as a coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab15 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB15.pdf |