WI AB149 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.52 (13) and 77.53 (10); and to create 77.54 (64) of the statutes; Relating to: sales and use tax exemption for the sale of gun safes. (FE)
Title
Sales and use tax exemption for the sale of gun safes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Representatives Barca and Shankland added as coauthors |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab149 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB149.pdf |