WI AB149 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 256.35 (10) (a) of the statutes; relating to: false reporting of an emergency and providing a penalty.
Title
False reporting of an emergency and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Andrew Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | House | Published 4-23-2012 |
2012-04-10 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-9-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 275 |
2012-04-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2012-02-15 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs |
2011-10-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-10-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2011-10-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-18 | House | Placed on calendar 10-20-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-09-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-09-28 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2011-09-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-09-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-05-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-05-25 | House | Introduced |