WI AB148 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 227.135 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: expiration of statements of scope for administrative rules. (FE)
Title
Expiration of statements of scope for administrative rules. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2017-06-07 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2017-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-04-26 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Neylon |
2017-04-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab148 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB148.pdf |