WI AB147 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-17)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Executive action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 100.52 (6); to amend 100.52 (10) (a) and 100.52 (10) (b); and to create 100.52 (1) (bd), 100.52 (4) (a) 4., 100.52 (4) (a) 5., 100.52 (6) (c), 100.52 (10) (c) and 100.523 of the statutes; Relating to: caller ID spoofing, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caller ID spoofing, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12HouseExecutive action taken
2019-09-10HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sanfelippo
2019-05-09HousePublic hearing held
2019-04-10HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-04-01HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback