WI AB147 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 961.55 (8); to amend 94.67 (2), 97.02 and 961.01 (14); and to create 20.115 (7) (gc), 94.55, 348.27 (18) (a) 1. e., 961.32 (3) and 961.55 (8) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: industrial hemp, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2017-05-30HouseRepresentative Genrich added as a coauthor
2017-05-08HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-03-15HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
2017-03-15HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback