WI AB146 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-23)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 447.06 (2) (a) 4. and 447.06 (2) (b) and (c) (intro.); and to create 447.06 (2) (a) 9. of the statutes; Relating to: the practice of dental hygienists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The practice of dental hygienists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HousePublished 6-22-2017
2017-06-21HouseReport approved by the Governor on 6-21-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 20
2017-06-20HousePresented to the Governor on 6-20-2017
2017-05-11HouseReport correctly enrolled on 5-11-2017
2017-05-11HouseLRB correction
2017-05-02HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2017-05-02SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-05-02SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended
2017-05-02SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-05-02SenateRead a second time
2017-04-28SenatePlaced on calendar 5-2-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-04-26SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-04-26SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-04-06SenateExecutive action taken
2017-04-06SenatePublic hearing held
2017-04-05SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services
2017-04-05SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-04-04HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-04-04HouseRepresentatives Zepnick and Barca added as coauthors
2017-04-04HouseRead a third time and passed
2017-04-04HouseRules suspended
2017-04-04HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-04-04HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2017-04-04HouseRead a second time
2017-03-30HousePlaced on calendar 4-4-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-03-30HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-03-30HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-03-30HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-03-29HouseExecutive action taken
2017-03-28HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier
2017-03-22HousePublic hearing held
2017-03-20HouseRepresentative Vruwink added as a coauthor
2017-03-15HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2017-03-15HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback