WI AB144 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.10 (4) (i); and to create 20.835 (2) (cd) and 71.07 (8n) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a refundable individual income tax credit for the parent of a stillbirth and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a refundable individual income tax credit for the parent of a stillbirth and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-08-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-19 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-03-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced |