WI AB144 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: skills enhancement grants and making an appropriation.
Title
Skills enhancement grants and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Local Government, Small Business, Tourism and Workforce Development |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-06-12 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2019-06-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-31 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz |
2019-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-27 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab144 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB144.pdf |