WI AB144 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.045 (1); and to create 118.045 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: the commencement of fall classes in public schools.
Title
The commencement of fall classes in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-19 | House | Representative Murphy withdrawn as a coauthor |
2015-11-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-04-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab144 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB144.pdf |