WI AB143 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 757.19 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: disqualification of a judge or justice.
Title
Disqualification of a judge or justice.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Rep. Jon Richards [D] | Rep. Sandra Pasch [D] | Rep. Dana Wachs [D] |
Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] | Rep. Cory Mason [D] | Rep. Jill Billings [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] |
Rep. Chris Taylor [D] | Rep. Mandy Wright [D] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
Rep. Penny Schaber [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up (Y: 39 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 59 |
2013-10-17 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and State Licensing and referred to committee on State Affairs and Government Operations pursuant to Assembly Resolution 19 |
2013-06-14 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and referred to committee on Government Operations and State Licensing pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-15 | House | Introduced |