WI AB14 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Published 4-9-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Published 4-9-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 563.03 (4p), 563.04 (11), 563.04 (14), 563.905 (title), 563.905 (intro.), 563.908 (1), 563.908 (2), 563.909, 563.93 (2), 563.93 (2m), 563.93 (4) (b), 563.93 (8), 563.935 (3), 563.935 (10), 563.98 (1) (e), 563.98 (1c) and 563.98 (1m); to renumber 563.907; to renumber and amend 563.905 (1), 563.905 (2), 563.908 (intro.), 563.93 (1), 563.93 (1s), 563.93 (3), 563.93 (4) (a), 563.93 (4m), 563.93 (5), 563.93 (6), 563.93 (7), 563.93 (9), 563.935 (6) and 563.97; to amend 563.02 (1), 563.03 (4e), 563.03 (4m), 563.03 (5r), 563.03 (11), 563.03 (12r), 563.04 (2), 563.04 (3), 563.05 (2), 563.05 (3), 563.05 (4), 563.10, 563.91, 563.92 (2), 563.92 (4), 563.935 (1), 563.935 (4), 563.935 (5), 563.935 (9), 563.94, 563.95, 563.98 (1) (intro.), 563.98 (1) (f), 563.98 (1g), 563.98 (2) and 945.01 (3) (b) 1.; to repeal and recreate 563.05 (title) and 563.92 (1m); and to create 563.02 (1m), 563.03 (10m), 563.03 (14w), 563.03 (17), 563.05 (4m), 563.925, 563.93 (2g) (intro.), (a), (b), (g) and (h), 563.93 (2r), 563.93 (3e), 563.93 (3i), 563.93 (3m), 563.935 (1m), 563.935 (6) (b), 563.935 (6) (c), 563.97 (2) and 563.98 (1e) of the statutes; Relating to: the regulation of raffles. (FE)
Title
The regulation of raffles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 6 |
2015-04-07 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-23-2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-17-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-02-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-02-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-02-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-02-12 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2015-02-12 | House | Read a second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on calendar 2-12-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-02-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-02-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced |