WI AB133 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.1105 (6) (f) 2. (intro.), 66.1105 (6) (f) 2. a., 66.1105 (6) (f) 2. b. and 66.1105 (6) (f) 2. c.; to renumber 66.1105 (14); to renumber and amend 66.1105 (6) (f) 2. d.; to amend 66.1105 (2) (i), 66.1105 (6) (e) 1. a., 66.1105 (6) (f) 1. a., 66.1105 (14) (title), 66.1106 (2) (c) and 66.1106 (7) (e) (intro.); and to create 66.1105 (6) (h) and 66.1105 (14) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: modifying the requirements for sharing tax increments by tax incremental districts, limiting the participation of certain special purpose districts in tax incremental district financing, and authorizing any tax incremental district to use allocated tax increments donated from another tax incremental district. (FE)
Title
Modifying the requirements for sharing tax increments by tax incremental districts, limiting the participation of certain special purpose districts in tax incremental district financing, and authorizing any tax incremental district to use allocated tax increments donated from another tax incremental district. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2015-10-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab133 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB133.pdf |