WI AB132 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 60.85 (6) (e) and 66.1105 (3) (g); to renumber and amend 66.1105 (6m) (c) and 66.1106 (10) (a); to amend 60.85 (4) (a) 1., 60.85 (8) (c) (intro.), 66.1105 (4m) (a) and 66.1106 (3) (a); and to create 60.85 (4) (d), 60.85 (6) (f), 60.85 (8) (c) 1. to 7., 66.1105 (4m) (f), 66.1105 (6m) (c) 1. to 7., 66.1105 (6m) (e), 66.1106 (3) (e), 66.1106 (10) (a) 1. to 7. and 66.1106 (10m) of the statutes; Relating to: standing joint review boards, annual joint review board meetings, annual reports on tax incremental districts, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Standing joint review boards, annual joint review board meetings, annual reports on tax incremental districts, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2015-10-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2015-03-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab132 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB132.pdf |