WI AB131 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Published 8-5-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Published 8-5-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 92.06 (1) (b) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: membership in county land conservation committees.
Title
Membership in county land conservation committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Published 8-5-2023 |
2023-08-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 8-4-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 32 |
2023-08-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023 |
2023-06-09 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-9-2023 |
2023-06-07 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-04-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-04-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-04-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-04-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Representative Shelton added as a coauthor |
2023-04-18 | House | Read a second time |
2023-04-13 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-04-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-04-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-04-05 | House | Representative Considine added as a coauthor |
2023-04-04 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-04-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-03-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced |