WI AB13 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.445 (1) (bb) and 106.27 (1k) of the statutes; Relating to: workforce training grants for seminars in high-demand fields to teach new skills and provide micro-credentials and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Workforce training grants for seminars in high-demand fields to teach new skills and provide micro-credentials and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-03-12 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2019-03-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab13 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB13.pdf |