WI AB13 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - Published 2-5-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - Published 2-5-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 968.20 (1m) (b) and 968.20 (2); and to create 968.20 (1m) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: the return of a seized firearm to the person who owns the firearm. (FE)
Title
The return of a seized firearm to the person who owns the firearm. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | House | Published 2-5-2016 |
2016-02-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 141 |
2016-02-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-3-2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-26-2016 |
2016-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Goyke, Wachs, Spreitzer, Meyers, Hesselbein, Hintz, Subeck, Sargent, Considine, Berceau, Pope, Kessler and Zamarripa |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-03-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2015-03-05 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-02-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Goyke and Kessler |
2015-02-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Goyke and Kessler |
2015-02-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl |
2015-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-05 | House | LRB correction |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative R. Brooks added as a coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced |