WI AB129 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Public hearing held
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Public hearing held
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 940.225 (2) (j) and 940.225 (5) (abm) of the statutes; Relating to: sexual assault by a health care provider and providing a penalty.
Title
Sexual assault by a health care provider and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-14 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2023-11-13 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-11-08 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-10-19 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-10-19 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-09-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-09-07 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2023-06-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2023-06-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-30 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2023-03-30 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2023-03-24 | House | Introduced |