WI AB128 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 40.02 (1); to amend 40.03 (6) (a) and 40.03 (6) (b); and to create 40.02 (1d), 40.03 (6) (m) and 40.56 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the group insurance board from contracting for or providing abortion services.
Title
Prohibiting the group insurance board from contracting for or providing abortion services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 191 |
2018-04-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-02-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-26-2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c) |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 34 |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Subeck, Barca, Sinicki, Sargent, Shankland, Pope, Hebl, Kessler, Brostoff, Anderson, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Fields, Genrich, Goyke, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, Mason, Meyers, Milroy, Ohnstad, Riemer, Spreitzer, Stuck, Vruwink, Wachs, Young, Zamarripa and Zepnick |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 34 |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Anderson, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Fields, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Kolste, Mason, Meyers, Milroy, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stuck, Subeck, Vruwink, Wachs, Young, Zamarripa and Zepnick |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 7, Noes 3 |
2017-04-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Subeck, Kolste and Zamarripa |
2017-04-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Zamarripa, Kolste and Subeck |
2017-04-24 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2017-04-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |