WI AB125 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 16.3075, 20.505 (7) (fp) and 20.505 (7) (hp) of the statutes; Relating to: housing quality standards loans, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Housing quality standards loans, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-06-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35 |
2019-06-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stuck, Billings, Brostoff, Crowley, Considine, Cabrera, Bowen, Doyle, Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Gruszynski, Zamarripa, Sargent, C. Taylor, Ohnstad, Riemer, Pope, Hebl, Vining, Kolste, Fields, Neubauer and Vruwink |
2019-06-18 | House | Read a second time |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2019-06-11 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2019-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-06-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Stuck and Zamarripa |
2019-06-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pronschinske |
2019-05-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-03 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2019-03-26 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduced |