WI AB125 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Published 5-7-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Published 5-7-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Wisconsin State Attorneys Association for the 2014-15 fiscal year, covering employees in the professional legal collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)
Title
Ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Wisconsin State Attorneys Association for the 2014-15 fiscal year, covering employees in the professional legal collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Published 5-7-2015 |
2015-05-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 5-6-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 17 |
2015-05-05 | House | Presented to the Governor on 5-5-2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-29-2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 99, Noes 0 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |