WI AB124 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Representative Bowen added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 447.01 (1e), 447.01 (8) (az), 447.01 (11) and 447.059 of the statutes; Relating to: dentists administering certain vaccines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentists administering certain vaccines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2021-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Subeck added as a coauthor
2021-03-11HousePlaced on calendar 3-16-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-03-11HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-03-11HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2021-03-11HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2021-03-10HouseExecutive action taken
2021-03-09HousePublic hearing held
2021-03-08HouseRepresentative Hintz added as a coauthor
2021-03-04HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks
2021-03-04HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback