WI AB124 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 9.01 (1) (ag) 1m.; and to amend 9.01 (1) (ad), 9.01 (1) (ag) 1., 9.01 (1) (ag) 2., 9.01 (1) (ag) 3. and 9.01 (1) (ag) 3m. of the statutes; Relating to: fees for election recounts. (FE)
Title
Fees for election recounts. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Jill Billings [D] |
Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] |
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] |
Rep. Rob Swearingen [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Sen. Devin LeMahieu [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-28 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2015-05-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-27 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2015-05-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zamarripa |
2015-04-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab124 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB124.pdf |