WI AB123 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Published 6-26-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Published 6-26-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 60.85 (2) (b) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: limited authorization for the town of Rome in Adams County to make cash grants or loan subsidies to owners, lessees, or developers of land located in a tax incremental district created by the town. (FE)
Title
Limited authorization for the town of Rome in Adams County to make cash grants or loan subsidies to owners, lessees, or developers of land located in a tax incremental district created by the town. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Sen. Roger Roth [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Published 6-26-2015 |
2015-06-25 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 6-25-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 24 |
2015-06-24 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-24-2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-18-2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Commerce, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Executive session held |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Commerce |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a second time |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-23 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |