WI AB122 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.09 (2m) (a) 2. and 341.09 (2m) (d); and to create 341.09 (2m) (a) 1m. and 341.09 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: issuance of temporary motor vehicle operation plates and permits to dealers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Issuance of temporary motor vehicle operation plates and permits to dealers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-17 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2023-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-03-24 | House | Introduced |