WI AB122 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 348.16 (3); to renumber and amend 349.16 (3); and to create 348.16 (3) (b) and 349.16 (3) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting certain vehicles of utilities from class B highway weight limitations and certain special or seasonal weight limitations. (FE)
Title
Exempting certain vehicles of utilities from class B highway weight limitations and certain special or seasonal weight limitations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 44 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-28-2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Read a second time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar 4-14-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-04-08 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2015-04-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Czaja |
2015-04-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-31 | House | Representative Macco added as a coauthor |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |