WI AB122 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 111.335 (1) (d) of the statutes; relating to: permitting an educational agency to refuse to employ or to terminate from employment an unpardoned felon. (FE)
Title
Permitting an educational agency to refuse to employ or to terminate from employment an unpardoned felon. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-11-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-01 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Kessler, Young, E. Coggs, Grigsby, Sinicki, Berceau, Bernard Schaber, Pocan, Milroy, Roys, Seidel, Pope-Roberts and Turner |
2011-11-01 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Kessler, Young, E. Coggs, Grigsby, Sinicki, Berceau, Bernard Schaber, Pocan, Roys, Seidel, Pope-Roberts and Turner |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on calendar 11-1-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-06 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2011-10-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-08-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-07-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-05-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2011-05-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab122 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB122.pdf |