WI AB12 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.192 (1) (c) and 238.137 of the statutes; Relating to: new internship grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
New internship grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R] | Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] |
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-03-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Rohrkaste |
2019-03-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rohrkaste |
2019-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab12 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB12.pdf |