WI AB12 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 104.001; to renumber 104.01 (1); to renumber and amend 104.045; to amend 49.141 (1) (g), 103.67 (2) (fm) 3., 103.70 (2) (b) 3., 104.01 (intro.), 104.01 (8), 104.05, 104.07 (1), 104.07 (2), 104.10, 104.11, 234.94 (5), 234.94 (8), 800.09 (1j), 800.095 (1) (d) and 895.035 (2m) (c); and to create 104.01 (1d), 104.01 (1g), 104.01 (5m), 104.01 (7m), 104.035 and 104.045 (2) and (3) of the statutes; Relating to: a state minimum wage, permitting the enactment of local living wage ordinances, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
A state minimum wage, permitting the enactment of local living wage ordinances, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-19 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Jobs and the Economy and take up (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-19 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Jobs and the Economy and take up, Ayes 35, Noes 61 |
2015-04-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced |