WI AB119 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 632.375 of the statutes; Relating to: motor vehicle repair practices.
Title
Motor vehicle repair practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-23 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2015-10-23 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-10-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-04-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative E. Brooks |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab119 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB119.pdf |