WI AB117 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 425.109 (1) (d); to amend 425.109 (1) (intro.), 425.109 (1) (b), 425.109 (1) (f), 425.109 (1) (h), 425.109 (2), 425.109 (3) and 425.205 (4); and to create 425.1025, 425.109 (1) (d) 2. and 425.109 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: pleading requirements under the Wisconsin Consumer Act.
Title
Pleading requirements under the Wisconsin Consumer Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Paul Farrow [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Published 3-1-2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 155 |
2016-02-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Ringhand, C. Larson, L. Taylor, Carpenter, Wirch, Hansen, Lassa, Risser, Miller and Vinehout |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations and Consumer Protection |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 37 |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 5 offered by Representative Hintz |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 37 |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Hintz |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Hintz |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 62, Noes 36 |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Hintz |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2015-11-03 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hintz |
2015-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2015-10-28 | House | Placed on calendar 11-3-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2015-10-27 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2015-10-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Born and Doyle |
2015-09-29 | House | Senator Stroebel added as a cosponsor |
2015-09-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2015-03-27 | House | Introduced |